EP0154499 - Method for diagnosis of A.I.D.S. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gross, Albert A., trading as Diagnostic Immunology Research Associates 4 World Trade Center, Suite 6228 New York New York 10048 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states Gross, Albert A., trading as Diagnostic Immunology Research Associates 4 World Trade Center, Suite 6228 New York New York 10048 / US | ||
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states Gross Albert A. and Dittmer Thomas H., trading as Diagnostics Immunology Research Associates 4 World Trade Center, Suite 6228 New York New York 10048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gross, Robert L. 450 Sutter Street San Francisco California 94108 / US | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Heath, Derek James, et al BROMHEAD & CO. 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | [1985/37] | Application number, filing date | 85301302.7 | 26.02.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | US19840584658 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: US 584658 | [1985/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0154499 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0154499 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154499 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/56972 (EP);
G01N33/56988 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Diagnose von A.I.D.S. | [1985/37] | English: | Method for diagnosis of A.I.D.S. | [1985/37] | French: | Procédé de diagnostic du S.I.D.A. | [1985/37] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/40] | 21.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.1989 | BE | 02.08.1989 | CH | 02.08.1989 | LI | 02.08.1989 | NL | 02.08.1989 | SE | 02.08.1989 | LU | 28.02.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/12] | AT | 02.08.1989 | |
BE | 02.08.1989 | ||
CH | 02.08.1989 | ||
LI | 02.08.1989 | ||
NL | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | AT | 02.08.1989 | |
CH | 02.08.1989 | ||
LI | 02.08.1989 | ||
NL | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/17] | CH | 02.08.1989 | |
LI | 02.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | USB554039I [ ]; | US4455379 [ ] (BEKESI JULIUS G [US], et al) | [A] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 76, no. 3, March 1983, no. 18687, Philadelphia, PA, US; K. MORIKAWA: "Heterogenous reactivities of lymphcytotoxic antibodies in patients with systemic lupus erythematosus: Evidence for pre-B-cell antibodies", & JPN. J. ALLERGOL 31(11), 1102-1109, 1982 | Examination | US554039 |