EP0157499 - Lubricating agents for use in the production of carbon yarns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1986 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takemoto Yushi Kabushiki Kaisha 2-5, Minato-machi Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states Takemoto Yushi Kabushiki Kaisha 2-5, Minato-machi Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Tsukasa 30 Ichiba Kamigo-machi Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Isobe, Jun 1-113 aza Kitaura Futagawa-machi Toyohashi-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Ablewhite, Alan James, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Ablewhite, Alan James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301397.7 | 28.02.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | JP19840039540 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: JP 3954084 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0157499 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D01F9/22, D01F9/14 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
D01F9/145 (EP);
D01F9/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1985/41] | Title | German: | Schmiermittel und deren Anwendung bei der Herstellung von Karbonfasern | [1985/41] | English: | Lubricating agents for use in the production of carbon yarns | [1985/41] | French: | Agents lubrifiants et leur utilisation dans la fabrication de fibres de carbone | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 16.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 10.06.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/49] | 07.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4080417 ; | [X]US4009248 ; | [X]GB2059407 ; | [X]GB2041901 |