EP0159135 - Method and apparatus for drilling hard material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Masse, Roger 131, Roussin Street Thetford Mines Quebec, G6G 1N6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states Masse, Roger 131, Roussin Street Thetford Mines Quebec, G6G 1N6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al A. R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al A. R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301669.9 | 11.03.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | US19840588741 | 12.03.1984 Original published format: US 588741 | [1985/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159135 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159135 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E21D9/10 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
E21D9/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bohren von hartem Material | [1985/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for drilling hard material | [1985/43] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour le forage de matériaux durs | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/26] | 17.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB190912249 (BENNETT GEORGE ROCKWELL [US]); | [A]FR533298 ; | [Y]US2792205 (HAGENBOOK LOY D); | [A]DE2432877 ; | [X]US3981540 (HAWKES IVOR); | [A]FR2420642 (BORIE ENTR TRAVAUX PUBLICS AND [FR]) | Examination | CA1133954 |