EP0157529 - Improvements relating to optical wavelength-selective arrangements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pendleton-Hughes, Simon Mark 14 Austin Street Northampton / GB | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Nicholson, Ronald Intellectual Property Department The Plessey Company plc 2-60 Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Nicholson, Ronald Intellectual Property Department The Plessey Company plc 2-60 Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301864.6 | 18.03.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | GB19840007689 | 24.03.1984 Original published format: GB 8407689 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157529 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/28 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
G02B6/2937 (EP);
G02B6/2938 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | Wellenlängentrennende optische Anordnung | [1985/41] | English: | Improvements relating to optical wavelength-selective arrangements | [1985/41] | French: | Arrangement de sélection des longueurs d'ondes optique | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |