EP0164182 - JFET active load input stage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1989 [1989/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRECISION MONOLITHICS INC. 1500 Space Park Drive Santa Clara California 95050 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states PRECISION MONOLITHICS INC. 1500 Space Park Drive Santa Clara California 95050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Butler, James R. 925 Foxridge Way San Jose California 95133 / US | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301899.2 | 19.03.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | US19840615996 | 31.05.1984 Original published format: US 615996 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0164182 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164182 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
H03F3/4508 (EP,US);
H03F3/45291 (EP,US);
H03F3/45381 (EP,US);
H03F3/45654 (EP,US);
H03F3/45659 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45304 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45648 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/50] | Title | German: | JFET Eingangsstufe mit aktiver Last | [1985/50] | English: | JFET active load input stage | [1985/50] | French: | Etage d'entrée JFET à résistance de charge active | [1985/50] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/14] | 09.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4121169 (IWAMATSU MASAYUKI); | [Y]US3851270 (VOSTEEN R); | [AP]EP0115165 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US3947778 (HSIAO PERNG, et al); | [A]US3852679 (SCHADE O); | [A]US3873933 (WHEATLEY JR CARL FRANKLIN) | Examination | EP0127832 |