EP0164824 - Clamping mechanism for the cutter of a microtome [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Instruments GmbH Heidelberger Strasse 17-19 D-69226 Nussloch / DE | [1991/44] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states Cambridge Instruments GmbH Postfach 1120 Heidelberger Strasse 17-19 D-6907 Nussloch bei Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berleth, Manfred, Ing. Grad. Schulstrasse 34 D-6904 Eppelheim / DE | [1985/51] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/51] | Coxon, Philip Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301935.4 | 20.03.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | DE19843413278 | 07.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3413278 | [1985/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164824 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164824 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164824 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/06 | [1985/51] | CPC: |
G01N1/06 (EP);
G01N2001/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, SE [1985/51] | Title | German: | Klemmvorrichtung für das Messer eines Mikrotomes | [1985/51] | English: | Clamping mechanism for the cutter of a microtome | [1985/51] | French: | Mécanisme de serrage du couteau d'un microtome | [1985/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 14.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3308704 (ROLF BURKHARDT); | [X]US3540335 (SITTE HELLMUTH); | [X]GB1307974 (NAT RES DEV); | [X]DE2143529 (JUNG AG FABRIK FUER PRAEZISION); | [X]FR2529678 (REICHERT OPTISCHE WERKE AG [AT]); | [E]EP0158484 (PARKE DAVIS & CO [US]); | [E]EP0159155 (PARKE DAVIS & CO [US]) |