EP0157554 - Polypropylene sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1990 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki City, Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueeda, Ryuhei 760-2, Fukushima Kurashiki-city Okayama-pref. / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Kiyonobu 103-4, Kawabe Mabi-cho Kibi-gun Okayama-pref. / JP | 03 /
Narukawa, Hiroshi 1433-10, Misu Soja-city Okayama-pref. / JP | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Crampton, Keith John Allen, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1985/41] | Application number, filing date | 85301984.2 | 22.03.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | JP19840062447 | 29.03.1984 Original published format: JP 6244784 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157554 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157554 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157554 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
B29C55/02 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08J2323/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/41] | Title | German: | Polypropylenfolie | [1985/41] | English: | Polypropylene sheet | [1985/41] | French: | Feuille de polypropylène | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 27.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58047048 ; | [Y]GB1276023 (KALLE AG [DE]); | [Y]AT367782B (CHEMIE LINZ AG [AT], et al); | [X]US3380868 (RABIN MOSER) | [Y] - TELESYSTEMES QUESTEL, WPIL, Derwent Abstract 83-40549K, March 18, 1983; & JP-A-58 047 048 (TAKIRON K.K.) & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, UNEXAMINED APLLICATIONS, FIELD C, VOL.7, NO 135, JUNI 11, 1983 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESEW GOVERNMENT PAGE 18 C 170; & JP-A-58 047 048 (TAKIRON K.K), & JP58047048 A 00000000 |