EP0160398 - Signal processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamanishi, Kazuhiro 3-121, Arakawa Higashiosaka-shi Osaka-fu 577 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Masaaki 1-224, Nishitada Higashitouge Kawanishi-shi Hyogo-ken, 666-01 / JP | [1985/45] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302172.3 | 28.03.1985 | [1985/45] | Priority number, date | JP19840061456 | 28.03.1984 Original published format: JP 6145684 | JP19840069380 | 06.04.1984 Original published format: JP 6938084 | [1985/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0160398 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0160398 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/89 | [1985/45] | CPC: |
H04N9/896 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verarbeiten von Signalen | [1985/45] | English: | Signal processing apparatus | [1985/45] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de signal | [1985/45] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/20] | 27.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.09.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3931638 ; | [Y]WO8103098 ; | [Y]US3947874 ; | [A]US4120000 ; | [XP]FR2543391 ; | [XP]DE3345142 |