EP0174708 - A method of measuring refractive index profile of cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOTO UNIVERSITY 36 Yoshidahon-Machi Sakyo-ku Kyoto City Kyoto-Fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | For all designated states KYOTO UNIVERSITY 36 Yoshidahon-Machi Sakyo-ku Kyoto City Kyoto-Fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jinno, Hiroshi 87 Koyama-Nishiohno-cho Kita-ku Kyoto City Kyoto-Fu / JP | 02 /
Yao, Takeshi 4-3615 Gotenyama-Minami-Machi Hirakata City Osaka-Fu / JP | [1986/12] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1986/12] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302182.2 | 28.03.1985 | [1986/12] | Priority number, date | JP19840191645 | 14.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19164584 | [1986/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0174708 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0174708 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0174708 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/41 | [1986/12] | CPC: |
G01N21/412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung der Beugungsindexverteilung in einem Stab | [1986/12] | English: | A method of measuring refractive index profile of cylinder | [1986/12] | French: | Méthode pour la mesure du profil d'indice de réfraction d'un cylindre | [1986/12] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/14] | 07.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4181433 (MARCUSE DIETRICH [US]); | [A]US4227806 (WATKINS LAURENCE S); | [A]US4286979 (BUCKLER MICHAEL J, et al) |