EP0157611 - Fluorochemical biuret compositions and fibrous substrates treated therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, John Cheng-Chung c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, 2501 Hudson Road P.O.Box 33427, St. Paul, Minnesota 55133 / US | [1993/45] |
Former [1985/41] | 01 /
Chang, John Cheng-Chung c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85302213.5 | 29.03.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | US19840595901 | 02.04.1984 Original published format: US 595901 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0157611 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157611 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C275/02, C07C311/00, D06M13/402, D06M15/576 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
C07C275/62 (EP,KR,US);
C07C275/00 (KR);
D06M13/432 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T442/2172 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2189 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2246 (EP,US);
Y10T442/227 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1985/41] | C07C127/24, C07C143/74, D06M13/40, D06M15/576 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/41] | Title | German: | Fluorchemische Biuretzusammensetzungen und damit behandelte fasrige Substrate | [1985/41] | English: | Fluorochemical biuret compositions and fibrous substrates treated therewith | [1985/41] | French: | Compositions fluorochimiques à base du biuret et matières fibreuses traitées avec celles-ci | [1985/41] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 28.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0103752 [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | US4293713 [ ] (FUJIMURA HAJIME, et al); | US4215205 [ ] (LANDUCCI DENNIS P [US]); | US4401780 [ ] (STEEL CYNTHIA L [US]); | US4024178 [ ] (LANDUCCI DENNIS P); | US3896251 [ ] (LANDUCCI DENNIS P); | US3398182 [ ] (GUENTHNER RICHARD A, et al) |