EP0158497 - Method and apparatus for the detection of biologically active agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company Mack Centre Drive P.O. Box 2224 Paramus New Jersey 07652-1149 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company Mack Centre Drive P.O. Box 2224 Paramus New Jersey 07652-1149 / US | ||
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company Mack Centre Drive P.O. Box 2224 Paramus New Jersey 07652-1149 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahnell, Joseph E. 4519 Hydes Road Baltimore Maryland / US | 02 /
Perks, H. Mark 935 Litchfield Road Baltimore Maryland / US | 03 /
Sussman, Mark L. 2104 Smith Avenue Baltimore Maryland / US | 04 /
Tice, Gregory 3 Weston Court Lutherville Maryland / US | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302261.4 | 01.04.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | US19840597633 | 06.04.1984 Original published format: US 597633 | [1985/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158497 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158497 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158497 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/02, C12M1/26 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
C12M41/34 (EP);
C12M41/36 (EP);
C12Q1/04 (EP);
C12Q2304/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Nachweis von biologisch aktiven Agenzien | [1985/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for the detection of biologically active agents | [1985/42] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la détection d'agents biologiquement actifs | [1985/42] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0104463 ; | [YD]US4073691 ; | [A]US4220715 ; | [A]US3935073 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, vol. 47, no. 4, July/August 1982, pages 1222-1225, Institute of Food Technologists, Chicago, Illinois, US; C.H.THRELKELD: "Detection of mircrobial contamination utilizing an infrared CO2 analyzer" |