EP0180286 - Container with stopper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1989 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU Updated state(s): BE | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frizon, Maud 40 East 90 Street New York New York 10028 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states Frizon, Maud 40 East 90 Street New York New York 10028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al Barlow, Gillett & Percival 94 Market Street Manchester M1 1PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al Barlow, Gillett & Percival 94 Market Street Manchester M1 1PJ / GB | ||
Former [1986/19] | Daunton, Derek Barlow, Gillett & Percival 94, Market Street Manchester M1 1PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302421.4 | 04.04.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | US19840664052 | 23.10.1984 Original published format: US 664052 | [1986/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0180286 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180286 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65D23/00, B65D1/02, B65D39/00 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
A45D34/02 (EP);
B65D1/00 (EP);
B65D39/00 (EP);
B65D39/0047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/19] | Title | German: | Behälter mit Stopfen | [1986/19] | English: | Container with stopper | [1986/19] | French: | Récipient avec bouchon | [1986/19] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 16.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 07.01.1987 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 26.03.1987 | Resumption of proceedings | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.1989 | BE | 11.01.1989 | NL | 11.01.1989 | SE | 11.01.1989 | LU | 30.04.1989 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/52] | AT | 11.01.1989 | |
NL | 11.01.1989 | ||
SE | 11.01.1989 | ||
BE | 30.04.1989 | ||
Former [1989/47] | AT | 11.01.1989 | |
SE | 11.01.1989 | ||
BE | 30.04.1989 | ||
Former [1989/39] | SE | 11.01.1989 | |
BE | 30.04.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 11.01.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | GB260261 [ ] (RAESFELD JEANNE DE GERSON); | FR790156 [ ] (WEINBRENNEREI HCH RAETSCH A G); | AT358982B [ ] (SCHOELLER LEBENSMITTEL, et al) |