EP0162562 - Preparation of foundry moulds and cores [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH INDUSTRIAL SAND LIMITED Holmethorpe, Redhill Surrey / GB | [1985/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westwood, Geoffrey William 4, Hurley Close Walsall West Midlands / GB | 02 /
Higgins, Raymond 1802, Bristol Road South Rednal Birmingham West Midlands / GB | [1985/48] | Representative(s) | Lewis, Samuel H., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/48] | Lewis, Samuel Hewitt, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85302472.7 | 09.04.1985 | [1985/48] | Priority number, date | GB19840009434 | 11.04.1984 Original published format: GB 8409434 | [1985/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0162562 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162562 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B22C1/22, C08L61/10 | [1985/48] | CPC: |
B22C1/2253 (EP,US);
C08K5/101 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/101, C08L61/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1989/02] |
Former [1985/48] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | Herstellung von Giessformen und Kernen | [1985/48] | English: | Preparation of foundry moulds and cores | [1985/48] | French: | Préparation de moules à fondre et noyaux | [1985/48] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1987/44: Divisional application 87111893 filed on 17.08.87 | Examination procedure | 20.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 22.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP87111893.1 / EP0259655 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.1989
20.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Reichhold Chemie AG CH-5212 Hausen bei Brugg / CH Opponent's representative Troesch, Jacques J. Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.1989
20.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Reichhold Chemie AG CH-5212 Hausen bei Brugg / CH Opponent's representative Troesch, Jacques J. Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | ||
Former [1989/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.1989
20.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Reichhold Chemie AG CH-5212 Hausen bei Brugg / CH Opponent's representative Troesch, Jacques J., Dr. sc. nat. Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Siewerdtstrasse 95 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | 16.10.1989 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 18.10.1989 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 20.11.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.03.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.03.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.12.1991 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CS146906 ; | [AD]EP0086615 (BORDEN UK LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0085512 (BORDEN UK LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0027333 (BORDEN UK LTD [GB]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 78, no. 25, 25th June 1973, Columbia, Ohio, USA; F. ESTERKA et al. "Concrete mixture with retarded solidification onset", page 244, column 2, abstract no. 163426t & CS-A-146 906 (15-01-1973), & CS146906 A 00000000 |