EP0159857 - Splice case for optical fibre cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. RAYCHEM S.A. Diestsesteenweg 692 B-3200 Kessel-lo / BE | [1985/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franckx, Joris Rene Isabella Halmenhoek 7 B-2820 Bonheiden / BE | 02 /
Doucet, Jos Grenstraat 95 B-3200 Kessel-Lo / BE | 03 /
Nolf, Jean-Marie Etienne Bierbeekstraat 89 B-3040 Korbeek / BE | [1990/30] |
Former [1985/44] | 01 /
Franckx, Joris Rene Isabella Halmenhoek 7 B-2820 Bonheiden / BE | ||
02 /
Doucet, Jos Grenstraat 95 B-3200 Kessel-Lo / BE | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | Benson, John Everett, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302511.2 | 10.04.1985 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | GB19840009368 | 11.04.1984 Original published format: GB 8409368 | [1985/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0159857 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0159857 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159857 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, G02B6/38 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
G02B6/4442 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/44] | Title | German: | Spleissbehälter für Kabel aus optischen Fasern | [1985/44] | English: | Splice case for optical fibre cable | [1985/44] | French: | Couverture d'épissage pour câble à fibres optiques | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 01.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/44] | 23.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Request for further processing for: | 29.08.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 25.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58221818 ; | [A]JP58162918 ; | [Y]US4373776 (PURDY MICHAEL L [CA]); | [Y]DE3133586 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0043570 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0077115 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 79 (P-267)(1516) 11 April 1984; & JP-A-58 221 818 (FUJITSU K.K.) 23-12-1983, & JP58221818 A 19840411 | [A] - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, vol. 3 of 3, 28 November - 1 December 1983, San Diego, pages 1183-1189; IEEE, New York, US; E.Y. LOYTTY: "Installation, splicing and testing of large cross-sectional FT3C fiber optic cables". | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 290 (P-245)(1435) 24 December 1983; & JP-A-58 162 918 (FUJITSU K.K.) 27-09-1983, & JP58162918 A 19831224 | Examination | JP58221818 | - PATENS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 79, (P-267) (1516), April 11, 1984. & JP-A-58 221 818 (FUJITSU K.K.) 23-12-1983, & JP58221818 A 00000000 |