EP0176164 - Methon of producing a corrosion resistant vacuum brazing sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/14] | Corrosion resistant vacuum brazing sheet | ||
[1990/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 865 Kaiser Building 300 Lakeside Drive Oakland California 94643 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | For all designated states KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 865 Kaiser Building 300 Lakeside Drive Oakland California 94643 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finnegan, Walter D. 3227 Inverness Drive Walnut Creek California 94598 / US | 02 /
Woods, Ralph A. A. 2292 Camino Brazos Pleasanton California 94566 / US | [1986/14] | Representative(s) | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302861.1 | 24.04.1985 | [1986/14] | Priority number, date | US19840634529 | 26.07.1984 Original published format: US 634529 | [1986/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176164 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176164 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/20, B32B31/14, B32B1/08, B23K35/28, B21C37/08, B21C37/14 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
B23K35/286 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12764 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1986/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Korrosionsbeständigen Vakuumhartlötschicht | [1990/26] | English: | Methon of producing a corrosion resistant vacuum brazing sheet | [1990/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une feuille destinée au brasage sous vide et résistant à la corrosion | [1990/26] |
Former [1986/14] | Korrosionsbeständige Vakuumhartlötschicht | ||
Former [1986/14] | Corrosion resistant vacuum brazing sheet | ||
Former [1986/14] | Feuille destinée au brasage sous vide et résistant à la corrosion | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 25.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.06.1990 | NL | 27.06.1990 | [1991/33] |
Former [1991/24] | BE | 27.06.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | US3994695 [ ] (SETZER WILLIAM C, et al); | AT347139B [ ] (ALUSUISSE [CH]); | DE2848652 [ ] (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA); | GB2007547 [ ] (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA); | GB2008460 [ ] (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA) | by applicant | US2821014 | US3788824 | US3881879 | US3963454 | US3994695 | US4039298 | US4093782 | US4167410 | US4172548 | US4339510 |