EP0164879 - Silicone primer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Silicone Company Limited Mitsui Building No. 6 2-8 Nihombashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states Toray Silicone Company Limited Mitsui Building No. 6 2-8 Nihombashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirai, Kazuo 1-6, Nishi, Yushudai Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Matsushita, Takao 9-18, 2-chome, Ohkubo Kisarazu-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | [1985/51] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 85303185.4 | 03.05.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | JP19840089952 | 04.05.1984 Original published format: JP 8995284 | [1985/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0164879 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164879 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C09D3/82, C08J5/12 | [1985/51] | CPC: |
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
C09D183/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
C09D183/06, C08L2666/28 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/51] | Title | German: | Organopolysiloxanzusammensetzungen für Grundschichten | [1985/51] | English: | Silicone primer composition | [1985/51] | French: | Compositions de polysiloxanes pour couches primaires | [1985/51] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 09.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB2068397 (TORAY SILICONE CO); | [YD]EP0044672 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0044673 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]); | [Y]FR2353597 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]); | [A]FR2321523 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]); | [A]US3772122 (YOUNG D) |