EP0161890 - Plastic wheeled cart chassis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1989 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.1989 [1989/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHRIG, B. Houston 4539 Gorham Street Corona Del Mar California 92625 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states Rehrig, B. Houston 4539 Gorham Street Corona Del Mar California 92625 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Frost, Dennis Thomas, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | [1985/47] | Application number, filing date | 85303190.4 | 03.05.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | US19840607128 | 04.05.1984 Original published format: US 607128 | [1985/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0161890 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0161890 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/10 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
B62B3/14 (EP);
B62B2501/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Fahrgestell aus Kunststoff für Rollhandwagen | [1985/47] | English: | Plastic wheeled cart chassis | [1985/47] | French: | Châssis en plastique pour chariot à roues | [1985/47] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 25.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/11] | 22.09.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2537214 [ ]; | US4268049 [ ]; | US3844577 [ ]; | US3999774 [ ]; | US4273346 [ ] |