EP0164894 - Detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 10.08.1993 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, Robert James 19 Hillview Road Irby Wirral Merseyside L61 4XH / GB | 02 /
Hardman, Paul David 51 Woodyear Road Bromborough Wirral Merseyside L62 6AY / GB | 03 /
Scott, Melvin 6 Kentridge Drive Great Sutton South Wirral Cheshire L62 2SY / GB | 04 /
Walsh, Carey James 2 Westbourne Road Wallasey Merseyside L44 2EW / GB | 05 /
Winterbotham, Peter 169 Poulton Royd Drive Spital Bebington Wirral Merseyside L63 9YP / GB | [1985/51] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/17] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1991/08] | Thomas, Susan Margaret UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1990/38] | Green, Mark Charles Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1990/23] | Ford, Michael Frederick MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1989/22] | Green, Mark Charles Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1987/30] | Waldren, Robin Michael Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1985/51] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85303280.3 | 09.05.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | GB19840012048 | 11.05.1984 Original published format: GB 8412048 | GB19840027160 | 26.10.1984 Original published format: GB 8427160 | [1985/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164894 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164894 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164894 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/12, C11D1/37, C11D1/29 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
C11D3/0094 (EP,US);
C11D1/123 (EP,US);
C11D1/37 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (EP,US);
C11D1/523 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/51] | C11D1/12, C11D1/37 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/51] | Title | German: | Detergens-Zusammensetzungen | [1985/51] | English: | Detergent compositions | [1985/51] | French: | Compositions détergentes | [1985/51] | Examination procedure | 06.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 19.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.1991
22.01.1992
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.1991
22.01.1992
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 27.01.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.07.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 31.01.1993 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.03.1991 | BE | 20.03.1991 | [1998/15] |
Former [1992/10] | AT | 20.03.1991 | |
BE | 20.03.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 20.03.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3936317 (LEHMANN HANS-JURGEN, et al); | [Y]US4072632 (REED DAVID ALAN); | [A]GB2021141 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON); | [A]EP0071410 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [AP]EP0112044 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [AP]EP0112046 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [AP]EP0115923 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [AP]EP0124367 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [E]FR2564103 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [E]GB2166149 (UNILEVER PLC) |