EP0181051 - Telephone apparatus with speaker amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.1988 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIERBAUM-MARTIN, INC. One Whitehall Street New York, N.Y. 10004 / US | [1986/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Primavera, Angelo 2648 Frances Street Bellmore New York, 11710 / US | [1986/20] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85303415.5 | 15.05.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | US19840668576 | 05.11.1984 Original published format: US 668576 | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0181051 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0181051 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/62, H04M1/60 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
H04M1/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/20] | Title | German: | Fernsprechgerät mit Empfangsverstärker | [1986/20] | English: | Telephone apparatus with speaker amplifier | [1986/20] | French: | Appareil téléphonique avec amplificateur de réception | [1986/20] | File destroyed: | 16.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 29.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/41] | 20.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.02.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RADIO ENGINEERING, vol. 26-27, no. 1, January 1972, pages 16-20, WashingtonUS; I.M. GRUBENKO et al.: "The ATG-70 loud-speaking telephone set" |