EP0163502 - Atherectomy device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/49] | Atherectomy device and method | ||
[1990/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEVICES FOR VASCULAR INTERVENTION INC. 750 Welch Road Palo Alto California 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states DEVICES FOR VASCULAR INTERVENTION INC. 750 Welch Road Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, John Bush 116 Fox Hollow Road Woodside California 94062 / US | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85303693.7 | 24.05.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | US19840615298 | 30.05.1984 Original published format: US 615298 | US19850732691 | 10.05.1985 Original published format: US 732691 | [1985/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163502 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163502 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163502 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61B17/32, A61M29/02, A61M25/00 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
A61B17/22031 (EP);
A61M25/10181 (US);
A61B17/320016 (EP);
A61B17/320783 (EP);
A61M25/10184 (US);
A61B10/0275 (EP);
A61B10/04 (EP);
A61B2017/00845 (EP);
A61B2017/00853 (EP);
A61B2017/22038 (EP);
A61B2017/22052 (EP);
A61B2017/22074 (EP);
A61B2017/22075 (EP);
A61B2090/064 (EP);
A61B2090/3933 (EP);
A61B90/06 (EP);
A61F2/01 (EP);
A61M2025/1093 (EP);
A61M25/1002 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1986/44] | A61B17/22, A61B17/32, A61M29/02 | ||
Former IPC [1985/49] | A61B17/22, A61B17/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für Atherektomie | [1990/29] | English: | Atherectomy device | [1990/29] | French: | Dispositif pour athérectomie | [1990/29] |
Former [1985/49] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für Atherektomie | ||
Former [1985/49] | Atherectomy device and method | ||
Former [1985/49] | Dispositif et procédé pour athérectomie | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/29: Teilanmeldung 89202513.1 eingereicht am 24/05/85 | EPB 1990/29: Divisional application 89202513.1 filed on 24/05/85 | EPB 1990/29: Demande divisionnaire 89202513.1 déposée le 24/05/85 | Examination procedure | 02.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 01.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89202513.1 / EP0352872 | EP95106553.1 / EP0669106 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1161400 (DRAPIER); | [A]US3811448 (MORTON A); | [A]US3990453 (DOUVAS NICHOLAS G, et al); | [A]GB2044103 (ROSS D N); | [A]US4295464 (SHIHATA ALFRED A); | [A]WO8200408 (FOGARTY T [US]); | [A]EP0086048 (AUTH DAVID C) |