EP0167268 - Rotary air valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffman, Donald Edward 78 Willowcrest Drive West Seneca New York 14224 / US | 02 /
McDonald, David Bradley 6430 Tonawanda Creek Road Lockport New York 14094 / US | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | Breakwell, John Neil Bower, et al GM Patent Section Vauxhall Motors Limited Luton Office (F6) P.O. Box No. 3 Kimpton Road Luton Bedfordshire LU2 OSY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | Breakwell, John Neil Bower, et al GM Patent Section Vauxhall Motors Limited Luton Office (F6) P.O. Box No. 3 Kimpton Road Luton Bedfordshire LU2 OSY / GB | Application number, filing date | 85303743.0 | 29.05.1985 | [1986/02] | Priority number, date | US19840624115 | 25.06.1984 Original published format: US 624115 | [1986/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0167268 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/02 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
B60H1/00685 (EP);
F24F13/04 (EP);
F24F13/10 (EP);
B60H2001/00714 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/02] | Title | German: | Drehbares Lüftungsventil | [1986/02] | English: | Rotary air valve | [1986/02] | French: | Clapet rotatif de ventilation | [1986/02] | File destroyed: | 16.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 31.01.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |