EP0166557 - Process for Waste Treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interox America 3333 Richmond Avenue Houston Texas 77098 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states Interox America 3333 Richmond Avenue Houston Texas 77098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walton, John Ray 15719 Spruce Point Drive Houston Texas 77084 / US | 02 /
Rutz, Jeffrey Allen 15900 Space Centre Apartment M2 Houston Texas 77062 / US | [1986/01] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Timothy, et al Solvay Interox Limited Patent Department PO Box 51 Moorfield Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 0HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | Pearce, Timothy, et al Solvay Interox Limited Patent Department P.O. Box 51 Moorfield Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 0FE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304251.3 | 14.06.1985 | [1986/01] | Priority number, date | US19840624245 | 25.06.1984 Original published format: US 624245 | [1986/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0166557 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0166557 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0166557 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/72 | [1986/01] | CPC: |
C02F1/722 (EP,US);
C02F1/725 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Abfällen | [1986/01] | English: | Process for Waste Treatment | [1986/01] | French: | Procédé de traitement de déchets | [1986/01] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 18.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP53012152 ; | [A]JP50061057 ; | [A]US3186942 (MICHAEL BENGER); | [A]US3617567 (MATHRE OWEN BERTWELL); | [Y]US4292293 (JOHNSON DONALD A, et al); | [A]US4294703 (WILMS KLAUS G, et al); | [AD]US4443342 (STAS GEORGES [BE], et al); | [A]US4552668 (BROWN RICHARD A [US], et al) | [X] - JAPANESE PATENTS GAZETTE, SECTION CH:CHEMICAL, week A11, 29th January - 4th February 1978, page 6, class D15, abstract no. 20624A/11, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-53 012 152 (TORAY INDS INC.) 03-02-1978, & JP53012152 A 00000000 | [Y] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 160, August 1977, pages 38-39, abstract no. 16044; "Ein neues Verfahren zur Oxidation photographischer Abwasser" | [A] - JAPANESE PATENTS GAZETTE, Part 1, section Chemical, week X39, 8th August - 14th August 1976, class J5, page 1, abstract no. 72722X/39, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-50 061 057 (MITSUBISHI KAKOK) 26-05-1975, & JP50061057 A 00000000 |