EP0166572 - Tamper indicating closure with tear-off band [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/01] | Tamper indicating closure with tear-off band | ||
[1990/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1991 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One SeaGate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One SeaGate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | ||
Former [1988/19] | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One Seagate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | ||
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. One Sea Gate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lininger, Michael Allen 1427 Craigwood Road Toledo Ohio 43612 / US | [1986/01] | Representative(s) | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304377.6 | 19.06.1985 | [1986/01] | Priority number, date | US19840623659 | 22.06.1984 Original published format: US 623659 | [1986/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0166572 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0166572 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0166572 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34 | [1986/01] | CPC: |
B65D41/3428 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/01] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsverschluss mit einem zerreissbaren Streifen | [1986/01] | English: | Tamper indicating closure with tear-off band | [1990/20] | French: | Fermeture inviolable munie d'une bande d'arrachage | [1986/01] |
Former [1986/01] | Tamper indicating closure with tear-off band | Examination procedure | 26.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 29.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2559827 (OBRIST AG ALBERT); | [Y]FR2439140 (BOUCHONS PLASTIQUES); | [YD]FR2499519 (GRUSSEN JEAN [FR]); | [A]WO8303809 (CEBAL [FR]); | [X]WO8304402 (CONTINENTAL WHITE CAP INC [US]) |