EP0167339 - Logic circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1992 [1992/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shoji, Norio c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Masashi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304513.6 | 25.06.1985 | [1986/02] | Priority number, date | JP19840136236 | 30.06.1984 Original published format: JP 13623684 | [1986/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0167339 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0167339 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167339 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/086, H03K3/286 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
H03K3/2885 (EP,US);
H03K19/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/02] | Title | German: | Logische Schaltung | [1986/02] | English: | Logic circuit | [1986/02] | French: | Circuit logique | [1986/02] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 23.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1230079 (MOTOROLA INC); | [A]DE1814213 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [X]US3502900 (STRAUB DIETER); | [Y]US3509362 (BARTHOLOMEW FREDERICK O); | [X]US3515904 (STOPPER HERBERT); | [X]DE2006285 (LICENTIA GMBH) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 10, March 1977, pages 3736,3737, New York, US; H.D. VARADARAJAN: "Programmable swing current switch for low-power high-speed circuits" |