EP0169008 - FCC catalyst stripping method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/04] | FCC catalyst stripping method and apparatus | ||
[1991/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haddad, James Henry 45 Van Wyck Drive Princeton Junction New Jersey 08550 / US | 02 /
Owen, Hartley 5 Riverview Terrace Belle Mead New Jersey 08502 / US | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Anthony, et al Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | [1987/05] |
Former [1986/04] | West, Alan Harry Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304726.4 | 02.07.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | US19840632086 | 18.07.1984 Original published format: US 632086 | US19840632084 | 18.07.1984 Original published format: US 632084 | US19840632085 | 18.07.1984 Original published format: US 632085 | [1986/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169008 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169008 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18, B01J8/18 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP);
B01J8/0055 (EP);
B01J8/386 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum "Stripping"von katalytischen Wirbelschichtspaltungskatalysatoren | [1991/45] | English: | FCC catalyst stripping method | [1991/45] | French: | Méthode pour le "stripping" d'un catalyseur de craquage catalytique fluidisé | [1991/45] |
Former [1986/04] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum "Stripping" von katalytischen Wirbelschichtspaltungskatalysatoren | ||
Former [1986/04] | FCC catalyst stripping method and apparatus | ||
Former [1986/04] | Méthode et appareillage pour le "stripping" d'un catalyseur de craquage catalytique fluidisé | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/45: Divisional application 88106583 filed on 25.04.88 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 20.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88106583.3 / EP0317700 | EP90120675.5 / EP0421484 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/44] | Request for further processing for: | 21.12.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.07.1992 | BE | 31.07.1992 | [1993/47] |
Former [1993/21] | BE | 31.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4219407 (HADDAD JAMES H [US], et al); | [A]US4364905 (FAHRIG ROBERT J, et al); | [AD]US4043899 (ANDERSON CONROY D, et al); | [X]US3123547 |