EP0171906 - Exterior rearview mirrors for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.1988 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.S.G. Overseas Limited Burgess House 1270 Coventry Road Birmingham B25 8BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states B.S.G. Overseas Limited Burgess House 1270 Coventry Road Birmingham B25 8BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desforges, Patrick Jean James 65 rue du Docteur Siffre F-77930 Perthes-en-Gatenais / FR | 02 /
Harry, Jean-Michel 68 avenue de la Foset F-77210 Avon / FR | 03 /
Cluet, Yves 46 rue de la Republique F-77210 Avon / FR | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Hollinghurst, Antony Britax Childcare Limited 1 Churchill Way West Andover Hampshire SP10 3UW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Hollinghurst, Antony B.S.G. International plc Patent Department Castle Trading Estate East Street Portchester, Hants PO16 9SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304729.8 | 02.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | GB19840017606 | 10.07.1984 Original published format: GB 8417606 | [1986/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171906 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171906 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
B60R1/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/08] | Title | German: | Aussenrückblickspiegel für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1986/08] | English: | Exterior rearview mirrors for vehicles | [1986/08] | French: | Rétroviseur extérieur pour véhicules | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 13.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.12.1987 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE3248759 (HARMAN INT IND [DE]); | [A]FR2477081 (PRECISION LYONNAISE [FR]); | [A]DE3008031 (MITTELHAEUSER BERNHARD) |