|
22.03.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.11.1999 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
26.02.1999 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1999 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
39 |
|
01.02.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1998 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
30 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.1998 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.02.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.02.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
41 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.1994 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.01.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.07.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.06.1993 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1993 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.01.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.1993 |
Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.1992 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.06.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.06.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1991 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1991 |
Cover page: Decision (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.10.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
16.10.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1991 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.1991 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.1991 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.1991 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1991 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
19.04.1991 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1991 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.11.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.1990 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
26.05.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.1990 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.1989 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.1989 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.1989 |
Information concerning the posting of documents in due time |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1989 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.1987 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.1987 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1987 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.1987 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1987 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.1985 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1985 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.1985 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.1985 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.07.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.07.1985 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1985 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |