EP0171949 - Microwave plasma etching apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.07.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1993 | Opposition rejected | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujimura, Shuzo c/o Fujitsu Limited Patent Department 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, 211 / JP | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Sunderland, James Harry, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305217.3 | 23.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | JP19840152363 | 23.07.1984 Original published format: JP 15236384 | [1986/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0171949 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0171949 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171949 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, H05H1/46 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
H01J37/32623 (EP,US);
H01L21/145 (KR);
H01J37/3053 (EP,US);
H01J37/32357 (EP,US);
H01J37/3266 (EP,US);
H01J37/32678 (EP,US);
H01L21/302 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/08] | Title | German: | Mikrowellen-Plasma-Ätzvorrichtung | [1986/08] | English: | Microwave plasma etching apparatus | [1986/08] | French: | Appareil d'attaque par plasma à ondes hyperfréquences | [1986/08] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/48] | 15.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1990
28.09.1990
ADMISSIBLE LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 Postfach 15 55 63405 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Zapfe, Hans Patentanwalt Postfach 20 01 51 63136 Heusenstamm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1990
28.09.1990
ADMISSIBLE LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 Postfach 15 55 D-63405 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Zapfe, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 20 01 51 D-63136 Heusenstamm / DE | 05.11.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.05.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.03.1993 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.03.1993 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2402301 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [Y]DE3144016 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | [Y] - F.F. CHEN: "Introduction to Plasma Physics", 1977, pages 27-31, Plenum Press, New York, US; | [AD] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 126, no. 6, June 1979, pages 1024-1028, Princeton, New York, US; K. SUZUKI et al.: "The roles of ions and neutral active species in microwave plasma etching" |