EP0177134 - Liquid crystal head-up display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lopez, Frank Sam 8209 Otis Warren Michigan 48091 / US | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305376.7 | 29.07.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | US19840646148 | 31.08.1984 Original published format: US 646148 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177134 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, G02F1/13 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
G02B27/01 (EP);
G02B27/0101 (EP);
G02B2027/0194 (EP);
G02B5/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/15] | Title | German: | Navigationsanzeigegerät mit Bildübertragung mit einem Flüssigkristall | [1986/15] | English: | Liquid crystal head-up display | [1986/15] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage tête haute comportant un cristal liquide | [1986/15] | File destroyed: | 23.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1985 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 17.03.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |