EP0170512 - Coated surgical staple [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Florez, Hugo R. 56, Winston Drive Somerset New Jersey 08873 / US | 02 /
Tannhauser, Robert Joseph 59 Tanglewood West Piscataway, N.J. 08854 / US | [1986/06] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1986/06] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305391.6 | 29.07.1985 | [1986/06] | Priority number, date | US19840635763 | 30.07.1984 Original published format: US 635763 | [1986/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0170512 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170512 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/08, A61L31/00 | [1986/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/08 (KR);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
Y10S411/92 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, A61B17/08, C08L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L31/10, C08L27/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/06] | Title | German: | Beschichtete, chirurgische Klammer | [1986/06] | English: | Coated surgical staple | [1986/06] | French: | Agrafe chirurgicale revêtue | [1986/06] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.1990
28.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.1990
28.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.1990
United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Midsummer House 411C Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | 30.08.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.03.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.02.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.04.1992 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.04.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1997/33] | Appeal following opposition | 02.06.1992 | Appeal received No. T0514/92 | 05.08.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.06.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M01) [1995/26] | 27.07.1995 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/30] | 16.04.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 16.04.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 15.04.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.04.1996 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0092383 [ ] (ETHICON INC [US]); | US3209754 [ ] (BROWN ADOLPH M); | GB2052431 [ ] (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP) |