EP0171972 - Nuclear magnetic resonance radio frequency antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PICKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. 595 Miner Road Highland Heights Ohio 44143 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states PICKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. 595 Miner Road Highland Heights Ohio 44143 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Misic, George J. 11567 Riverbeach Hiram Ohio 44234 / US | 02 /
Lillo, Aarne 13772 Oakbrook Drive North Royalton Ohio 44133 / US | 03 /
Patrick, John L. 34680 Sherwood Drive Solon Ohio 44139 / US | 04 /
Holland, G. Neil 48 Daisy Lane Chagrin Falls Ohio 44022 / US | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Pope, Michael Bertram Wingate The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1986/08] | Application number, filing date | 85305445.0 | 31.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | US19840641570 | 16.08.1984 Original published format: US 641570 | [1986/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0171972 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0171972 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171972 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/30, G01R33/32 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
G01R33/34007 (EP,US);
G01R33/34046 (EP,US);
G01R33/3628 (EP,US);
G01R33/3657 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/08] | G01N24/04, G01N24/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/08] | Title | German: | Hochfrequenz-Antenne für magnetischen Kernresonanzapparat | [1986/08] | English: | Nuclear magnetic resonance radio frequency antenna | [1986/08] | French: | Antenne haute fréquence pour appareil à résonance magnétique nucléaire | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 27.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4095168 (HLAVKA LLOYD F); | [A]GB2026172 (UNIV CALIFORNIA); | [A]EP0073375 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0073614 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [A]EP0084946 (TECHNICARE CORP [US]); | [E]EP0160942 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [A] - REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, vol. 48, no. 1, 1977, pages 68-73, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; H.J.SCHNEIDER et al.: "Slotted tube resonator: a new NMR probe head at high observing frequencies" | [A] - REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, vol. 45, no. 9, September 1974, pages 1159-1163, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; K.E.KISMAN et al.: "Coupling scheme and probe damper for pulsed nuclear magnetic resonance single coil probe" |