EP0171980 - Full frame illumination system for a document reproduction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.1989 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durbin, John Alan 1283 Hunter Circle Webster New York 14580 / US | 02 /
Rees, James Dunlap 5880 Palmyra Road Pittsford New York 14534 / US | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305484.9 | 01.08.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | US19840637655 | 03.08.1984 Original published format: US 637655 | [1986/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171980 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171980 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/54, G03B27/00 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
G03B27/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/08] | Title | German: | Ganzbild-Belichtungssystem für ein Kopiergerät | [1986/08] | English: | Full frame illumination system for a document reproduction device | [1986/08] | French: | Système d'illumination à plein cadre pour appareil de reproduction de documents | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/42] | 22.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1350616 [ ] (RANK XEROX LTD); | US3491245 [ ] (HARDESTY GEORGE K C); | US4372068 [ ] (KNAPP PAUL A [US], et al); | US4072414 [ ] (HANSON WILLIAM J) |