EP0174094 - Imaging system using a full frame illumination array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durbin, John Alan 1283 Hunter Circle Webster New York 14580 / US | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305485.6 | 01.08.1985 | [1986/11] | Priority number, date | US19840637656 | 03.08.1984 Original published format: US 637656 | [1986/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0174094 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0174094 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/54, G03B27/00 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
G03B27/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/11] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungssystem unter Verwendung einer Ganzbildbelichtungseinrichtung | [1986/11] | English: | Imaging system using a full frame illumination array | [1986/11] | French: | Système pour réaliser une image par étalage d'illumination en plein cadre | [1986/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 09.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/42] | 02.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4094600 [ ] (WALY ADNAN); | US3591283 [ ] (PEISACH JOEL M); | US1841229 [ ] (VON TESCHENBRUCK MANO ZIFFER); | DE2736458 [ ]; | FR2358681 [ ] (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) | Examination | US3212417 |