EP0171992 - Pharmaceuticals containing prostaglandin I2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states SAGAMI CHEMICAL RESEARCH CENTER 4-5, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states SAGAMI CHEMICAL RESEARCH CENTER 4-5, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | |||
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Yuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 3-7, Ginza 8-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo104 / JP | ||
For all designated states SAGAMI CHEMICAL RESEARCH CENTER 4-5, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishibashi, Akira 4668-25, Ami Amimachi Inashika-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Horii, Daijiro 22-9, Amakubo 2-chome Sakuramura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Kanayama, Toshiji 4668-25, Ami Amimachi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Iseki, Katsuhiko 85-1-20-208, Tsukushino Abiko-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Shinoda, Masaki 4668-25, Ami Amimachi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 06 /
Ishiyama, Chiyoko 3707-2, Aza Ohtakebashi Oaza Ami Amimachi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 07 /
Hayashi, Yosio 1-174, Tagu Ushikumachi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 08 /
Shibasaki, Masakatsu 2-11-2, Shimorenjaku Mitaka-shi Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Sodeoka, Mikiko 3-47-26, Wakamatsu Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 10 /
Ogawa, Yuji 1-9-1, Minamidai Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 11 /
Mase, Toshiaki 4-4-1, Nishiohnuma Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1986/10] | Burnside, Michael Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1986/08] | Brock, Peter William Michael Burnside & Partners 2 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1HL / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305611.7 | 07.08.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | JP19840165669 | 09.08.1984 Original published format: JP 16566984 | [1986/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0171992 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0171992 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171992 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/557, // C07C405/00 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
C07C405/0083 (EP,US);
A61K31/557 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/08] | A61K31/557, // C07C177/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Arzneimittel die Prostaglandin I2 enthalten | [1986/08] | English: | Pharmaceuticals containing prostaglandin I2 | [1986/08] | French: | Médicaments contenant la prostaglandine I2 | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 20.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0134153 (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP]) | [A] - CHEMISTRY LETTERS, no. 4, April 1984, pages 579-582, The Chemical Society of Japan, Tokyo, JP; M. SODEOKA et al.: "Practical synthesis of (+)-9(0)-methano-delta6(9alpha)-PGI1. The highly potent carbon analog of prostacyclin" | [A] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 24, no. 33, August 1983, pages 3493-3496, Pergamon Press Ltd., Oxford, GB; M. SHIBASAKI et al.: "Synthesis of 9(0)-Methano-delta6(9alpha)-PGI1: the highly potent carbon analog of prostacyclin" |