EP0178047 - Colour printing data generation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LIMITED De La Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens London W1A 1DL / GB | [1986/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jordan, Brian 9 Lombardy Close Hemel Hempstead Herts / GB | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305678.6 | 09.08.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | GB19840022208 | 03.09.1984 Original published format: GB 8422208 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178047 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
H04N1/6011 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1986/16] | Title | German: | Farbdruckdatenerzeugung | [1986/16] | English: | Colour printing data generation | [1986/16] | French: | Génération de données d'impression en couleurs | [1986/16] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 22.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/07] | 31.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1989 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB1540525 ; | [A]US4037249 |