EP0172717 - Modified fluorocarbonylimino biurets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pechhold, Engelbert 111 Harvey Lane Chadds Ford, Pennsylvania 19317 / US | [1993/14] |
Former [1986/09] | 01 /
Pechhold, Engelbert 111 Harvey Lane Chadds Ford Pennsylvania 19317 / US | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305713.1 | 12.08.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | US19840644089 | 24.08.1984 Original published format: US 644089 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172717 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172717 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172717 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C275/00, D06M13/402 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
D06M13/428 (EP,US);
C07C275/62 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2915 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2962 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2969 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2172 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1986/09] | C07C127/24, D06M13/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/09] | Title | German: | Modifizierte Fluorcarbonylimino-Biuret | [1986/09] | English: | Modified fluorocarbonylimino biurets | [1986/09] | French: | Fluorocarbonylimino-biurets modifiés | [1986/09] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/14: Teilanmeldung 90106381.8 eingereicht am 12/08/85 | EPB 1993/14: Divisional application 90106381.8 filed on 12/08/85 | EPB 1993/14: Demande divisionnaire 90106381.8 déposée le 12/08/85 | Examination procedure | 25.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 21.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP90106381.8 / EP0383365 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/13] | Request for further processing for: | 01.08.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0103752 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) |