EP0172024 - Laser control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states UNITED KINGDOM ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Travis, Alan John Basil 41 Mattock Way Sadlers Field Abingdon Oxon / GB | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Wood, Paul Austin Patents Department AEA Technology plc 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Wood, Paul Austin United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority Patents Department Building 329 Harwell Laboratory Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305766.9 | 14.08.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | GB19840020861 | 16.08.1984 Original published format: GB 8420861 | [1986/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172024 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172024 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/13, G02B26/04, G02B26/08, G01J1/42, B23K26/04 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
H01S3/13 (EP,US);
G01J1/4257 (EP,US);
G02B26/04 (EP,US);
G02B26/0891 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/08] | H01S3/13, G01J1/42, G02B26/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/08] | Title | German: | Steuereinrichtung für einen Laser | [1986/08] | English: | Laser control system | [1986/08] | French: | Système de contrôle pour un laser | [1986/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 03.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/18] | 05.12.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4144505 (ANGELBECK ALBERT W, et al); | GB2050684 [ ] (SPECTRA PHYSICS); | [A]GB2059684 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH); | [A]US4344707 (MASSIE NORBERT A); | [A]US3746429 (SPINDEL A, et al); | [A]GB1537731 (AVCO EVERETT RES LAB INC); | [A]US4018535 (CASON III CHARLES M); | [A]US4260225 (WALLES WILHELM E) |