EP0177146 - Image retouching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LIMITED De La Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens London W1A 1DL / GB | [1986/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lai, Ching Tsueng 374 Long Chaulden Hemel Hempstead Herts / GB | 02 /
Mackenzie, David John 82 Gravel Lane Boxmoor Hemel Hempstead Herts / GB | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85305809.7 | 15.08.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | GB19840022209 | 03.09.1984 Original published format: GB 8422209 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0177146 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177146 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46, G06F3/023 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
H04N1/622 (EP,US);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1986/15] | Title | German: | Retuschieren von Bildern | [1986/15] | English: | Image retouching | [1986/15] | French: | Retouche d'images | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 13.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8002607 (HELL R GMBH [DE], et al) | [AD] - DATAMATION, vol. 25, no. 5, 1st May 1979, pages 150-156, Bariington, Illinois, US; R.G. SHOUP: "Superpaint ... the digital animator" | [AD] - COMPUTER, vol. 13, no. 6, June 1980, pages 45-54, Long Beach, US; W. MYERS: "Computer graphics: the human interface" | [A] - INFORMATION PROCESSING 80; PROCEEDINGS OF IFIP CONGRESS 80; Tokyo, JP, 6th-9th October 1980, Melbourne, AU, 14th-17th October 1980, pages 1039-1044, S.H. LAVINGTON, North-Holland Publishing Co.; C.F. HEROT: "A spatial graphical man-machine interface" | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 28, no. 10, May 1980, pages 161-166, Rochelle Park, US; B. HALE et al.: "Desktop computer clarifies graphics with vivid color" |