EP0196381 - Lead propelling mechanism for a mechanical pencil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.1989 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOTOBUKI & CO., LTD. 13 Nishi Kurisu-cho Shichiku Kita-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | For all designated states KOTOBUKI & CO., LTD. 13 Nishi Kurisu-cho Shichiku Kita-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kageyama, Hidehei c/o Kotobuki Co.Ltd. Kawagoe Factory 138 Inutake Aza kujirai Ooaza Kawagoe-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1986/41] | Representative(s) | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306055.6 | 27.08.1985 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | JP19850048121 | 02.04.1985 Original published format: JP 4812185 | [1986/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0196381 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196381 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B43K21/20, B43K21/00, B43K21/24 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
B43K21/003 (EP,US);
B43K21/20 (EP,US);
B43K21/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/41] | Title | German: | Minenvorschubmechanik für einen mechanischen Schreibstift | [1986/41] | English: | Lead propelling mechanism for a mechanical pencil | [1986/41] | French: | Mécanisme d'avancement de la mine pour crayon mécanique | [1986/41] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/12] | 29.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.1988 | BE | 30.11.1988 | CH | 30.11.1988 | LI | 30.11.1988 | NL | 30.11.1988 | SE | 30.11.1988 | [1990/03] |
Former [1989/52] | AT | 30.11.1988 | |
BE | 30.11.1988 | ||
NL | 30.11.1988 | ||
SE | 30.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/46] | AT | 30.11.1988 | |
BE | 30.11.1988 | ||
SE | 30.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/35] | BE | 30.11.1988 | |
SE | 30.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 30.11.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR922065 ; | [Y]FR1069168 (ANCIENS ETABLISSEMENTS BAIGNOL); | [X]US3804536 (TORII O, et al); | [X]US4386865 (KAGEYAMA HIDEHEI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0093815 (KOTOBUKI & CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0154073 (KOTOBUKI & CO LTD [JP]) |