EP0178057 - Anti-aliasing filter circuit for oscilloscopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1990 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saxe, Charles L. 18235 S.W. Barcelona Way Aloha Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
Jones, Roydn 12165 S.W. Burnett Ct. Beaverton Oregon 97005 / US | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Wright, Peter David John, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [1986/16] | Application number, filing date | 85306072.1 | 27.08.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | US19840652700 | 21.09.1984 Original published format: US 652700 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178057 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178057 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01R13/34 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
G01R13/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/16] | Title | German: | Anti-aliasing-Filter für Oszilloskope | [1986/16] | English: | Anti-aliasing filter circuit for oscilloscopes | [1986/16] | French: | Circuit de filtre "anti-aliasing" pour oscilloscopes | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 28.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4414638 (TALAMBIRAS ROBERT P [US]) | [A] - ELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, vol. 53, no. 11, May 1980, pages 161-167; T.P. DAGOSTINO et al.: "100-MHz oscilloscope displays innovations in digital storage" | [A] - ARCHIV FÜR ELEKTRONIK UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSTECHNIK, vol. 36, no. 9, September 1982, pages 349-355, Würzburg; H.W. SCHÜSSLER et al.: "On partly digital anti-aliasing filters" | [A] - WIRELESS WORLD, vol. 86, no. 1535, August 1980, pages 69-70, Haywards Heath, GB; G.J. ADAMS "Transient recorder" |