EP0173579 - Shaft seal for a compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terauchi, Kiyoshi 8-14 Heiwa-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma, 372 / JP | [1986/10] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306177.8 | 30.08.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | JP19840180619 | 31.08.1984 Original published format: JP 18061984 | [1986/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173579 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173579 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32, F16J15/16, F04D29/12 | [1986/10] | CPC: |
F04C27/009 (EP);
F04D29/12 (KR);
F16J15/3204 (EP);
F16J15/3248 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/10] | Title | German: | Wellendichtung für einen Kompressor | [1986/10] | English: | Shaft seal for a compressor | [1986/10] | French: | Etanchéité de l'arbre pour un compresseur | [1986/10] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 08.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2021775 [ ] (VOGEL PUMPEN); | DE2509370 [ ]; | GB821692 [ ] (LORENZO LORENZETTI); | DE2846240 [ ] (PLESSEY HANDEL INVESTMENT AG); | DE3244209 [ ] (KACO GMBH CO [DE]); | FR1391888 [ ] |