EP0177184 - Universal joint dismantler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1989 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1989 [1989/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skoworodko, Mike 2250 Cascade Street Abbotsford British Columbia, V2T 3G3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states Skoworodko, Mike 2250 Cascade Street Abbotsford British Columbia, V2T 3G3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Richards, David John, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1986/15] | Application number, filing date | 85306225.5 | 02.09.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | US19840646456 | 04.09.1984 Original published format: US 646456 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0177184 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177184 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/02, // B23P19/02 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
F16D3/405 (EP,US);
B25B27/062 (EP,US);
F16C35/062 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53861 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Demontagevorrichtung für ein Kreuzgelenk | [1986/15] | English: | Universal joint dismantler | [1986/15] | French: | Dispositif pour démontage de joints de cardan | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/46] | 25.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3008226 [ ] (KELLERMAN RAYMOND J); | US4343075 [ ] (GUPTILL ROBERT H, et al); | US4463489 [ ] (JAMES WILLIAM G [US]) |