EP0176312 - Adaptive filter update gain normalization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1986/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duttweiler, Donald Lars 34 Circle Drive Rumson New Jersey 07760 / US | 02 /
Hartung, John 58 Homestead Circle Marlboro New Jersey 07746 / US | [1986/14] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306609.0 | 17.09.1985 | [1986/14] | Priority number, date | US19840654410 | 26.09.1984 Original published format: US 654410 | [1986/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176312 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176312 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03H21/00, H04B3/23 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
H04B3/23 (EP,US);
H03H21/0012 (EP,US);
H03H2021/0078 (EP,US);
H04B3/238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/14] | Title | German: | Normalisierung der Bewertungsfaktoren eines adaptiven Filters | [1986/14] | English: | Adaptive filter update gain normalization | [1986/14] | French: | Normalisation des facteurs d'amplification d'un filtre adaptatif | [1986/14] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 14.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4468640 (GRITTON CHARLES W K [US]); | [Y]US4129753 (DUTTWEILER DONALD L) | Examination | US3922505 | - IEEE Transactions on Communications, Vol. COM-26, No. 5, May 1978, pp. 647-653 |