EP0178086 - Female urine bottle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1989 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1989 [1989/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERNON & COMPANY (PULP PRODUCTS) LTD. Slater Street Bolton Lancashire, BL1 2HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states VERNON & COMPANY (PULP PRODUCTS) LTD. Slater Street Bolton Lancashire, BL1 2HP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waller, Martin Sandybank House Brandwood Fold Edgeworth Bolton / GB | 02 /
Farrell, Geoffrey 87 Hough Lane Bromley Cross Bolton, BL7 9DE / GB | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306627.2 | 18.09.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | GB19840023639 | 19.09.1984 Original published format: GB 8423639 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178086 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178086 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61G9/00 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
A61G9/006 (EP);
A61G2200/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Urinflasche für Frauen | [1986/16] | English: | Female urine bottle | [1986/16] | French: | Urinal pour femmes | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 24.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2084788 (ANDERSON VIRGINIA H); | [Y]CH250768 (ZEDER ANTON [CH], et al); | [A]US3170170 (HATTIE DESLAURIERS); | [A]US3473172 (FRIEDMAN NATHAN H, et al); | [Y]DE2905161 (KEYES FIBRE CO); | [Y]DE8229743U |