EP0180321 - Modified membrane suppressor and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIONEX CORPORATION 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states DIONEX CORPORATION 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pohl, Christopher Andrew 32940 Soquel Union City California 94587 / US | 02 /
Slingsby, Rosanne Williamson 5144 Greentree Court Pleasanton California 94566 / US | 03 /
Stillian, John Raymond 856 Avalon Way Livermore California 94550 / US | 04 /
Gajek, Ryszard 165 11th Street San Francisco California 94103 / US | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85306830.2 | 25.09.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | US19840658148 | 04.10.1984 Original published format: US 658148 | [1986/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0180321 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0180321 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180321 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/96, G01N30/46 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
G01N30/84 (EP);
G01N30/96 (EP);
G01N2030/387 (EP);
G01N2030/965 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/19] | Title | German: | Modifizierter Membranunterdrücker und Anwendungsverfahren | [1986/19] | English: | Modified membrane suppressor and method of use | [1986/19] | French: | Suppresseur modifié à membrane et méthode d'utilisation | [1986/19] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 28.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59133459 ; | [AD]EP0069285 ; | [AD]US3920397 ; | [AD]EP0032770 | [A] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 53, no. 9, August 1981, pages 1488-1492, Easton, Pennsylvania, US; T.S. STEVENS et al.: "Hollow fiber ion-exchange suppressor for ion chromatography" | [A] - CHEMIE FÜR LABOR UND BETRIEB, vol. 34, no. 7, 1983, pages 293-297; J. WEISS et al.: "Einführung in die Ionenchromatographie" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 265 (P-318)[1702], 5th December 1984; & JP - A - 59 133 459 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 31.07.1984, & JP59133459 A 00000000 |