EP0191220 - Method of deactivating ethylene polymerisation catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.05.1994 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1994 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | 20.05.1994 | Change - revocation of patent | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CHEMICAL CORPORATION 11500 Northlake Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [1990/19] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states QUANTUM CHEMICAL CORPORATION (a Virginia corp.) 99 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | ||
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states QUANTUM CHEMICAL CORPORATION 99 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | ||
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states NATIONAL DISTILLERS AND CHEMICAL CORPORATION 99 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | ||
Former [1986/34] | For all designated states NORCHEM, INC 3100 Golf Road Rolling Meadows Illinois 60008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang, Yu-Tang 1520 Ninth Street N.W. Clinton, IA 52732 / US | 02 /
Pebsworth, Lloyd W. 920 12th Avenue S. Clinton, IA 52732 / US | 03 /
Dombro, Robert A. 857 N. Marsha Drive Palatine, IL 60067 / US | 04 /
Hoff, Raymond E. 244 South Oak Palatine, IL 60067 / US | [1991/17] |
Former [1986/34] | 01 /
Hwang, Yu-Tang 1520 Ninth Street N.W. Clinton Iowa 52732 / US | ||
02 /
Pebsworth, Lloyd W. 920 12th Avenue S. Clinton Iowa 52732 / US | |||
03 /
Dombro, Robert A. 857 N. Marsha Drive Palatine Illinois 60067 / US | |||
04 /
Hoff, Raymond E. 244 South Oak Palatine Illinois 60067 / US | Representative(s) | Spencer, Graham Easdale, et al A.A. Thornton & CO Northumberland House 303-306, High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [1986/34] | Application number, filing date | 85306960.7 | 30.09.1985 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | US19850689953 | 09.01.1985 Original published format: US 689953 | [1986/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191220 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191220 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191220 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F2/42 | [1986/34] | CPC: |
C08F6/02 (EP,US);
H01Q5/00 (KR);
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
H03F3/601 (EP,US);
H03H7/38 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F2/42 (US,EP);
C08F6/02, C08L23/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Desaktivierung von Ethylenpolymerisationskatalysatoren | [1986/34] | English: | Method of deactivating ethylene polymerisation catalysts | [1986/34] | French: | Procédé de désactivation de catalyseurs de polymérisation d'éthylène | [1986/34] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/17: (deleted) | EPB 1986/34: A request for correction of the specification and claims has been filed pursuant to Rule 88 EPC. A decision on the request will be taken during the proceedings before the Examining Division | Examination procedure | 31.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/41] | 18.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89202636.0 / EP0357159 | EP89202648.5 / EP0355935 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.1992
12.02.1992
ADMISSIBLE Repsol Quimica S.A. E-28003 Madrid / ES Opponent's representative Sturm, Hans Georg Patentanwalt Arabellastrasse 5/302 81925 München / DE | 02
24.01.1992
12.02.1992
ADMISSIBLE KYOWA Chemical Industry Co. Ltd. 305, Yashimanishi-machi Takamatsu, Kagawa 761-01 / JP Opponent's representative Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | 03
24.01.1992
17.02.1992
ADMISSIBLE Dow Benelux N.V. Postbus 48 NL-4530 AA Terneuzen / NL Opponent's representative Vossen, Johan A.M.J.H. Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.1992
12.02.1992
ADMISSIBLE Repsol Quimica S.A. E-28003 Madrid / ES Opponent's representative Sturm, Hans Georg, Dr. Patentanwalt Sckellstrasse 1 D-81667 München / DE | ||
02
24.01.1992
12.02.1992
ADMISSIBLE KYOWA Chemical Industry Co. Ltd. 305, Yashimanishi-machi Takamatsu, Kagawa 761-01 / JP Opponent's representative Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | |||
03
24.01.1992
17.02.1992
ADMISSIBLE Dow Benelux N.V. Postbus 48 NL-4530 AA Terneuzen / NL Opponent's representative Vossen, Johan A.M.J.H. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN The Hague / NL | |||
Former [1992/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.1992
ADMISSIBLE Repsol Quimica S.A. E-28003 Madrid / ES Opponent's representative Sturm, Hans Georg, Dr. Patentanwalt Sckellstrasse 1 D-81667 München / DE | ||
02
24.01.1992
ADMISSIBLE KYOWA Chemical Industry Co. Ltd. 305, Yashimanishi-machi Takamatsu, Kagawa 761-01 / JP Opponent's representative Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | |||
03
24.01.1992
Dow Benelux N.V. Postbus 48 NL-4530 AA Terneuzen / NL Opponent's representative de Jong, Nicolaas Henricus Maria Dow Benelux N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 48 NL-4530 AA Terneuzen / NL | 28.02.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.11.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.01.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.01.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/28] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56120739 ; | [X]EP0118092 (KYOWA CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, 1982, page 43, ref.no. 36263j; Columbus, Ohio, US & JP-A 56 120 739 (MITSUI PETROCHEM. IND. Ltd.) 22-09-1981, & JP56120739 A 00000000 | Examination | US4105609 | EP0143716 |