EP0178124 - Improved antiinflammatory salts of piroxicam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.1990 [1990/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lombardino, Joseph George 13, Laurel Hill Drive Niantic Connecticut / US | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85307059.7 | 02.10.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | US19840659733 | 11.10.1984 Original published format: US 659733 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178124 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178124 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/12, A61K31/54, // C07D417/04 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
C07D213/65 (EP,US);
C07D213/67 (EP,US);
C07D239/95 (EP,US);
C07D313/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Piroxicamsalze mit entzündungshemmender Wirkung | [1986/16] | English: | Improved antiinflammatory salts of piroxicam | [1986/16] | French: | Sels de piroxicame à activité anti-inflammatoire | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/16] | 02.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0050458 (PFIZER [US]); | [A]EP0066458 (PFIZER [US]); | [AD]GB2105193 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) |