EP0178942 - Surgical stapling instrument with jaw latching mechanism and disposable staple cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | ||
Former [1986/17] | For all designated states SENMED, INC. 8485 Broadwell Road Cincinnati Ohio 45244 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chow, Hector 439 Dartmouth Circle Cincinnati Ohio 45244 / US | 02 /
Melling, Hugh 7177 Hollywood Drive West Chester Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
Schieltz, Denise S. 6229 Savannah Avenue Cincinnati Ohio 45224 / US | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 85307521.6 | 17.10.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | US19840662622 | 19.10.1984 Original published format: US 662622 | US19850712201 | 15.03.1985 Original published format: US 712201 | [1986/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178942 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178942 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178942 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/17] | A61B17/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/17] | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Klammernahtgerät mit Klemmbackenabriegelung und Wegwerfklammermagazin | [1986/17] | English: | Surgical stapling instrument with jaw latching mechanism and disposable staple cartridge | [1986/17] | French: | Agrafeuse chirurgicale avec verrouillage de mâchoire et cartouche d'agrafes jetable | [1986/17] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/37: Teilanmeldung 89108683.7 eingereicht am 17/10/85 | EPB 1990/37: Divisional application 89108683.7 filed on 17/10/85 | EPB 1990/37: Demande divisionnaire 89108683.7 déposée le 17/10/85 | Examination procedure | 07.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 10.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89108683.7 / EP0340803 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3317105 (VASILJEVICH ASTAFJEV GEORGY, et al); | [AD]US3499591 (GREEN DAVID T); | [AD]EP0033548 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]); | [A]US4402444 (GREEN DAVID T [US]); | [AP]EP0136950 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) |