EP0179661 - Apparatus for holding waste material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eggers, Alfred George Box 112A, R. D. No. 1 Canonsburg Pennsylvania / US | [1986/18] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 85307675.0 | 24.10.1985 | [1986/18] | Priority number, date | US19840664449 | 24.10.1984 Original published format: US 664449 | [1986/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179661 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179661 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/36 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
G21F5/00 (KR);
G21F9/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/18] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Aufbewahrung von Abfallmaterial | [1986/18] | English: | Apparatus for holding waste material | [1986/18] | French: | Appareil pour contenir des matériaux résiduaires | [1986/18] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 13.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.02.1989 | GB | 24.10.1989 | SE | 25.10.1989 | [1999/42] |
Former [1990/42] | GB | 24.10.1989 | |
SE | 25.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/29] | SE | 25.10.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE640379 ; | [AP]AT376516B (WIENER BAUSTOFF UND BETONSTEIN [AT]); | [A]DE2359114 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG) |