EP0184304 - Method and system of drilling deviated wellbores [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.01.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beasley, Roy Dennis 2821 Cheyenne Street Irving Texas 70562 / US | 02 /
Dellinger, Thomas Baynes 1010 Springwood Lane Box 163 Duncanville Texas / US | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Anthony, et al Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | [1987/13] |
Former [1986/24] | West, Alan Harry Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 85307707.1 | 25.10.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | US19840669135 | 07.11.1984 Original published format: US 669135 | [1986/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184304 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/04, E21B4/20, E21B17/07, E21B4/00 | [1986/24] | CPC: |
E21B17/07 (EP);
E21B4/20 (EP);
E21B44/005 (EP);
E21B7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für das Bohren abgelenkter Bohrlöcher | [1986/24] | English: | Method and system of drilling deviated wellbores | [1986/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le forage de puits déviés | [1986/24] | File destroyed: | 14.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 20.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 14.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/08] | 01.09.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/08] | Request for further processing for: | 14.11.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE536490 ; | [X]GB764099 (BATAAFSCHE PETROLEUM); | [A]US2776817 (GREGORY JAMES N, et al); | [A]US3203184 (FRANK WHITTLE, et al); | [Y]US3497019 (ORTLOFF JOHN E); | [Y]US3713500 (RUSSELL M); | [X]US3827512 (EDMOND T); | [X]US3978930 (SCHROEDER RONDON L); | [A]US4384625 (ROPER WILBUR F, et al); | [X]EP0110182 (ADVANCED DRILLING CORP [US]); | [A]US4465147 (FEENSTRA ROBIJN [NL], et al); | [A]FR2544375 (ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE [FR]); | [E]EP0171259 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) |